NY S01309 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the certification of certain property complying with the residential-commercial urban exemption program and the revocation of benefits of such program in certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to the certification of certain property complying with the residential-commercial urban exemption program and the revocation of benefits of such program in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.132 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.244 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | substituted for a1367 |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.80 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01367 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - substituted by s1309