NY S01307 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a municipal corporation to allow disabled veterans who are not receiving public assistance, but who are entitled to the possession or to the use or occupancy of a dwelling unit, to be considered heads of households for purpose of eligibility for a tax abatement for rent regulated property.
Title
Authorizes a municipal corporation to allow disabled veterans who are not receiving public assistance, but who are entitled to the possession or to the use or occupancy of a dwelling unit, to be considered heads of households for purpose of eligibility for a tax abatement for rent regulated property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.638 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.116 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03648 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to real property taxation