NY S01303 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state office for the aging to report on the delivery of services to and needs of traditionally underserved populations in their annual report to the governor and legislature.
Title
Requires the state office for the aging to report on the delivery of services to and needs of traditionally underserved populations in their annual report to the governor and legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.547 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.360 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a880 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1151 |
2011-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A00880 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - substituted by s1303