NY S01293 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires businesses that make payments in lieu of taxes to provide local governments and school districts with notice of their intention to file for a change in assessment.
Title
Requires businesses that make payments in lieu of taxes to provide local governments and school districts with notice of their intention to file for a change in assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2018-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.262 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.120 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08859 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes