NY S01288 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the veteran career assistance program within the SUNY and CUNY systems to provide veterans with assistance in resume writing and employment placement services.
Title
Establishes the veteran career assistance program within the SUNY and CUNY systems to provide veterans with assistance in resume writing and employment placement services.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.802 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.881 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1288A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07338 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education