NY S01282 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes gambling on professional sporting events and athletic events sponsored by universities or colleges at betting facilities located at thoroughbred and harness racetracks operating in this state, in simulcast theaters operated by off-track betting corporations and in any constitutionally authorized casino facility; provides that the proceeds of such gambling be applied exclusively to or in aid or support of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes gambling on professional sporting events and athletic events sponsored by universities or colleges at betting facilities located at thoroughbred and harness racetracks operating in this state, in simulcast theaters operated by off-track betting corporations and in any constitutionally authorized casino facility; provides that the proceeds of such gambling be applied exclusively to or in aid or support of education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-10SenateOPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2017-01-13SenateTO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
2017-01-09SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05438 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - opinion referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback