NY S01281 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to facilitating appellate review of rulings that implicate issues of public concern.
Title
Relates to facilitating appellate review of rulings that implicate issues of public concern.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Brian Benjamin [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05688 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.185