NY S01271 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish standards for the distance certain sex offenders on probation or parole, or conditionally released, must reside from school grounds.
Title
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish standards for the distance certain sex offenders on probation or parole, or conditionally released, must reside from school grounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.287 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.502 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03259 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to correction