NY S01266 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "voting rights notification and registration act"; allows for voting participation by eligible voters with felony convictions by providing notice regarding voting rights, assistance with voter registration and voting by absentee ballot, and data sharing among the department of correctional services, the division of parole, and the state board of elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "voting rights notification and registration act"; allows for voting participation by eligible voters with felony convictions by providing notice regarding voting rights, assistance with voter registration and voting by absentee ballot, and data sharing among the department of correctional services, the division of parole, and the state board of elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2010-03-23 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
2010-01-06 REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2009-06-02 PRINT NUMBER 1266A
2009-06-02 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2009-04-28 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2009-01-28 REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A2266-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.191

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback