NY S01264 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the admissibility of images, maps, locations, distances, calculations or other information taken from a web mapping service; provides such shall be admissible if the date such material was created is included and provides such admissibility shall be subject to challenge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the admissibility of images, maps, locations, distances, calculations or other information taken from a web mapping service; provides such shall be admissible if the date such material was created is included and provides such admissibility shall be subject to challenge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-03-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-11Assemblyordered to third reading cal.25
2019-02-11Assemblysubstituted for a1489
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-01-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.18
2019-01-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A01489 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - substituted by s1264

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback