NY S01262 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of radar and laser blocking devices in all motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of radar and laser blocking devices in all motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.960
2017-01-06SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback