NY S01252 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "roadway excavation quality assurance act"; relates to workers on excavations; provides that utility companies or their contractors shall use competent workers and shall pay the prevailing wage on projects where a permit to use or open a street is required to be issued.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "roadway excavation quality assurance act"; relates to workers on excavations; provides that utility companies or their contractors shall use competent workers and shall pay the prevailing wage on projects where a permit to use or open a street is required to be issued.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-03SenateAMENDED 1252A
2021-04-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-04-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.832
2021-01-08SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A02057 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - print number 2057a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback