NY S01250 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the sale of forged instruments; includes the sale and manufacture of government issued documents in the class C felony of forgery in the first degree.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the sale of forged instruments; includes the sale and manufacture of government issued documents in the class C felony of forgery in the first degree.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-21Assemblyreferred to codes
2016-03-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-03-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2016-03-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2016-03-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.300
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2016-01-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-01-06Assemblydied in assembly
2015-03-18Assemblyreferred to codes
2015-03-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-03-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-03-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2015-03-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2015-03-10Senate1ST REPORT CAL.223
2015-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A04603 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback