NY S01250 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of correctional services to enter into agreements with counties and the city of New York to take custody of inmates serving a definite sentence of more than 90 days to alleviate overcrowding in local correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of correctional services to enter into agreements with counties and the city of New York to take custody of inmates serving a definite sentence of more than 90 days to alleviate overcrowding in local correctional facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-22 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2010-03-15 PRINT NUMBER 1250A
2010-03-15 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2010-01-06 REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2009-01-28 REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A10191 (Same As) 2010-03-10 - referred to correction

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback