NY S01246 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of health, in conjunction with the division of criminal justice services, to establish and maintain an electronic database, accessible to the public, of known synthetic cannabinoids.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of health, in conjunction with the division of criminal justice services, to establish and maintain an electronic database, accessible to the public, of known synthetic cannabinoids.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to health
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1700
2018-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-31SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to health
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1445
2017-06-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-01-06SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A04056 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback