NY S01244 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the penalties imposed upon gas and electric utilities for failure to file or correct an annual report with the public service commission; such penalties shall not be more than one-tenth of 1% of the utilities' annual net revenue for each day of violation, but not to exceed $25,000 nor be less than $100.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the penalties imposed upon gas and electric utilities for failure to file or correct an annual report with the public service commission; such penalties shall not be more than one-tenth of 1% of the utilities' annual net revenue for each day of violation, but not to exceed $25,000 nor be less than $100.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.251
2021-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback