NY S01239 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1239A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1239A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reimbursement of schools for purchasing New York farm products; establishes rates of reimbursement dependent upon the percentage that New York farm products constitute a school's food purchases.
Title
Relates to the reimbursement of schools for purchasing New York farm products; establishes rates of reimbursement dependent upon the percentage that New York farm products constitute a school's food purchases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1239A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01446 (Same As) 2018-02-26 - print number 1446a