NY S01234 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain misdemeanors involving the revocation and suspension of hunting, trapping or fishing licenses shall be punishable by imprisonment for not more than ninety days, or by a fine of not less than five hundred dollars nor more than one thousand dollars, or by both such imprisonment and fine.
Title
Provides that certain misdemeanors involving the revocation and suspension of hunting, trapping or fishing licenses shall be punishable by imprisonment for not more than ninety days, or by a fine of not less than five hundred dollars nor more than one thousand dollars, or by both such imprisonment and fine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1332 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1234A |
2019-03-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06219 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.532