NY S01233 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases access to substance abuse programming for incarcerated individuals whose first language is not English.
Title
Increases access to substance abuse programming for incarcerated individuals whose first language is not English.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.367 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00908 (Same As) 2024-07-22 - enacting clause stricken