NY S01224 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the volunteer firefighters' and ambulance workers' credit; increases the amount of the credit from $200 to $500 for single filers who have served for less than five years and from $200 to $1,000 for single filers who serve at least five years and from $400 to $1,000 for spouses filing jointly where one spouse has served less than five years and from $400 to $2,000 for spouses filing jointly who have each served at least five years.
Title
Relates to increasing the volunteer firefighters' and ambulance workers' credit; increases the amount of the credit from $200 to $500 for single filers who have served for less than five years and from $200 to $1,000 for single filers who serve at least five years and from $400 to $1,000 for spouses filing jointly where one spouse has served less than five years and from $400 to $2,000 for spouses filing jointly who have each served at least five years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-03-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1224A |
2017-03-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08039 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means