NY S01210 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the mental illness anti-stigma license plate and the mental illness anti-stigma fund.
Title
Creates the mental illness anti-stigma license plate and the mental illness anti-stigma fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.228 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.333 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a6216b |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED 1210C |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1040 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1210B |
2017-05-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1210A |
2017-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06216 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s1210c