NY S01210 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the department of corrections and community supervision in consultation with the director of the office of victim services to prepare and distribute the notification form for victims of violent felony offenses allowing them to demand to be informed regarding a name change petition by the defendant.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the department of corrections and community supervision in consultation with the director of the office of victim services to prepare and distribute the notification form for victims of violent felony offenses allowing them to demand to be informed regarding a name change petition by the defendant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.711 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10095 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - referred to codes