NY S01209 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the date of the public hearing to discuss the contents of the proposed budget of fire, fire alarm, and fire protection districts to be held during the third week of October.
Title
Authorizes the date of the public hearing to discuss the contents of the proposed budget of fire, fire alarm, and fire protection districts to be held during the third week of October.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.278 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.183 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a4979 |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-03-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.161 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04979 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1209