NY S01203 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a moratorium prohibiting certain broadband service terminations and disconnections during a state disaster emergency.
Title
Establishes a moratorium prohibiting certain broadband service terminations and disconnections during a state disaster emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-04-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1203B |
2024-04-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1203A |
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.292 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06270 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions