NY S01197 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health care plans and payors to have a minimum of twelve and one-half percent of their total expenditures on physical and mental health annually be for primary care services.
Title
Requires health care plans and payors to have a minimum of twelve and one-half percent of their total expenditures on physical and mental health annually be for primary care services.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-12-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1197B |
2023-12-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2023-12-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1197A |
2023-12-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.519 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08592 (Same As) 2024-01-12 - referred to insurance