NY S01195 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of children and family services to conduct a study on the effects of trauma on child development and learning.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of children and family services to conduct a study on the effects of trauma on child development and learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.196 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.70 |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | substituted for a1913 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-01-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.15 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01913 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.196