NY S01191 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation.
Title
Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1816 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1191B |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1191A |
2017-03-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02874 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES