NY S01180 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions permanent relating to disability due to disease or malfunction of the heart or coronary arteries.
Title
Makes provisions permanent relating to disability due to disease or malfunction of the heart or coronary arteries.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Steven Rhoads [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2024-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.236 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.302 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03033 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to local governments