NY S01179 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption from requirements for the alienation of parkland for renewable energy generating projects with a generating capacity not exceeding two megawatts and which are located above real property currently used for vehicle parking.
Title
Provides an exemption from requirements for the alienation of parkland for renewable energy generating projects with a generating capacity not exceeding two megawatts and which are located above real property currently used for vehicle parking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2024-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.126 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.202 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07269 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation