NY S01172 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of non-food wine or liquor supplies, accessories and/or barware.
Title
Relates to the sale of non-food wine or liquor supplies, accessories and/or barware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1373 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.266 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A02489 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to economic development