NY S01172 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Schenectady to accept an application for real property tax exemption from Union Graduate College.
Title
Authorizes the city of Schenectady to accept an application for real property tax exemption from Union Graduate College.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | SIGNED CHAP.456 | |
2010-08-18 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-24 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-24 | ordered to third reading rules cal.321 | |
2010-06-24 | substituted for a3336 | |
2010-02-22 | referred to ways and means | |
2010-02-22 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-02-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-02-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-02-08 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-02-02 | 1ST REPORT CAL.90 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-01-27 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03336 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - substituted by s1172