NY S01164 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Waives the state's sovereign immunity to liability for violations of the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990, the Fair Labor Standards Act, the Age Discrimination in Employment Act, and the Family and Medical Leave Act; waives the immunity of all instrumentalities and political subdivisions of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waives the state's sovereign immunity to liability for violations of the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990, the Fair Labor Standards Act, the Age Discrimination in Employment Act, and the Family and Medical Leave Act; waives the immunity of all instrumentalities and political subdivisions of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2023-05-15SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-05-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 1164A
2023-05-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2023-01-10SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06541 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - REFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback