NY S01163 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 1163A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 1163A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to net energy metering for fuel-flexible linear generator electric generating equipment.
Title
Relates to net energy metering for fuel-flexible linear generator electric generating equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 1163A |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1163B |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-02-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1163A |
2021-02-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03768 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - signed chap.691