NY S01162 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to provide written, public updates to the Draft New York State's COVID-19 Vaccination Program Plan.
Title
Requires the department of health to provide written, public updates to the Draft New York State's COVID-19 Vaccination Program Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.349 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1162A |
2021-02-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04539 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to health