NY S01139 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Sanborn Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association, Inc.
Title
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Sanborn Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association, Inc.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2228 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1798 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02228 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - signed chap.375