NY S01139 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Westchester to establish by local law an administrative adjudication hearing procedure for all code and ordinance violations relating to conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Title
Authorizes the county of Westchester to establish by local law an administrative adjudication hearing procedure for all code and ordinance violations relating to conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1099 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01214 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments