NY S01138 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey the North County Trailway, real property in Westchester county, to the county of Westchester.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey the North County Trailway, real property in Westchester county, to the county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.156 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.592 |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | substituted for a4017 |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-04-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-05 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.90 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.132 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04017 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - substituted by s1138