NY S01120 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides small businesses with grants of up to $100,000 to commercialize energy and environmental technology innovations and ideas in-state to stimulate economic development.
Title
Provides small businesses with grants of up to $100,000 to commercialize energy and environmental technology innovations and ideas in-state to stimulate economic development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-03-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1120C |
2014-03-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2014-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1120B |
2014-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1120A |
2013-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05536 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken