NY S01113 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires legislative approval for the closure of certain office of mental health, office for people with developmental disabilities or office of children and family services facilities and institutions.
Title
Requires legislative approval for the closure of certain office of mental health, office for people with developmental disabilities or office of children and family services facilities and institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1476 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1848 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00733 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to mental health