NY S01110 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to selling New York state labeled alcoholic beverages at retail for consumption on the premises of a holder of a farm distillery license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to selling New York state labeled alcoholic beverages at retail for consumption on the premises of a holder of a farm distillery license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08Assemblyreferred to economic development
2019-05-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.319
2019-01-11SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A06618 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback