NY S01106 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the termination of tenancy in housing occupied by substantially all persons over sixty-five years of age and/or persons with disabilities without cause; prohibits increasing rent more than one percent above the percentage change.
Title
Prohibits the termination of tenancy in housing occupied by substantially all persons over sixty-five years of age and/or persons with disabilities without cause; prohibits increasing rent more than one percent above the percentage change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.990 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO AGING |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05970 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to aging