NY S01102 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - SIGNED CHAP.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to early voting; provides that beginning the tenth day prior to any election and ending on and including the second day prior to the election a person duly registered and eligible to vote shall be permitted to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to early voting; provides that beginning the tenth day prior to any election and ending on and including the second day prior to the election a person duly registered and eligible to vote shall be permitted to vote.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24AssemblySIGNED CHAP.6
2019-01-14SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-14Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2019-01-14Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2019-01-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.9
2019-01-14Assemblysubstituted for a780
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-01-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.8
2019-01-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-10SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00780 (Same As) 2019-01-14 - substituted by s1102

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback