NY S01101 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires animal shelters and animal rescue groups to disclose whether a dog over the age of four months has known behavioral issues; states that a documented history of known behavioral issues shall not necessarily preclude a dog from being available for adoption.
Title
Requires animal shelters and animal rescue groups to disclose whether a dog over the age of four months has known behavioral issues; states that a documented history of known behavioral issues shall not necessarily preclude a dog from being available for adoption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1231 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1101A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |