NY S01099 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A775
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the board of elections shall transfer a registration and enrollment of a voter to wherever they move in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the board of elections shall transfer a registration and enrollment of a voter to wherever they move in the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A775
2019-01-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.5
2019-01-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-10SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00775 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - signed chap.3

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback