NY S01096 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot project for placement of inmates close to home; provides that such project would house inmates who are parents of minor children in the correctional facility located in closest proximity to the primary place of residence of any such inmate's minor child or children.
Title
Establishes a pilot project for placement of inmates close to home; provides that such project would house inmates who are parents of minor children in the correctional facility located in closest proximity to the primary place of residence of any such inmate's minor child or children.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06643 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to correction