NY S01092 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to re-defining the term physically helpless to mean an individual who is physically unable to communicate affirmative consent through words or clear actions that offer permission and a willingness to engage in sexual activity.
Title
Relates to re-defining the term physically helpless to mean an individual who is physically unable to communicate affirmative consent through words or clear actions that offer permission and a willingness to engage in sexual activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-04-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.729 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |