NY S01091 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.400
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.400
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a municipality to increase the number of years of service that a participant in a defined contribution plan or defined benefit plan service award program may receive a contribution for up to an additional ten years, to a maximum of fifty years; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes a municipality to increase the number of years of service that a participant in a defined contribution plan or defined benefit plan service award program may receive a contribution for up to an additional ten years, to a maximum of fifty years; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.400 |
2021-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.81 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a2239a |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1091A |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.158 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02239 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - substituted by s1091a