NY S01082 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to instruction concerning traffic stops in pre-licensing courses to provide drivers with their responsibilities when stopped by a law enforcement officer.
Title
Relates to instruction concerning traffic stops in pre-licensing courses to provide drivers with their responsibilities when stopped by a law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1082A |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.52 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01374 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation