NY S01058 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the agrivoltaics viability pilot program within the farmland viability program to provide grants to identify the best practices and strategies for dual-use solar energy projects that protect soil health during construction and decommissioning of solar arrays, utilize sustainable agricultural production practices, monitor any benefits solar energy may have on farms and to the state, track economic viability, study the commercialization of dual-use solar energy projects, and encourage equitable engagement of stakeholders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the agrivoltaics viability pilot program within the farmland viability program to provide grants to identify the best practices and strategies for dual-use solar energy projects that protect soil health during construction and decommissioning of solar arrays, utilize sustainable agricultural production practices, monitor any benefits solar energy may have on farms and to the state, track economic viability, study the commercialization of dual-use solar energy projects, and encourage equitable engagement of stakeholders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
2023-05-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-05-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 1058A
2023-05-04SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE
2023-01-09SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A02299 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to energy

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback