NY S01048 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to delete the requirement that registration for purposes of voting be completed at least ten days before election day and provides that laws be made to adequately safeguard against deception in the exercise of the right of suffrage.
Title
Amends the constitution to delete the requirement that registration for purposes of voting be completed at least ten days before election day and provides that laws be made to adequately safeguard against deception in the exercise of the right of suffrage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.6 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | substituted for a777 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.3 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00777 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY